THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:37:38 AM
Ulloa Gomez, Jose Liborio
CPSO#:
96888
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: UNIVERSIDAD DEL CAUCA, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2011 to 14 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Dec 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2012 |