skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 0:47:35 AM

Feroze, Nick Gordon Pervez

CPSO#: 96873

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

500 King St W #2
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-3444
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nicholas Feroze Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Feroze ( CPSO# 96873 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICK GORDON PERVEZ FEROZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEROZE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2012