skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 21:59:41 PM

Kaphengst, Karla J

CPSO#: 96866

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Boston University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenbrook Family Medical Centre
Unit 7
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: 519-570-1655
Fax: 519-570-3477 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunbeam Centre
2749 Kingsway Dr
Kitchener ON  N2C 1A7
Canada
Phone: (519) 893-6200
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Nevada

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:13 Aug 2015 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013 Active
 Dr.  Karla  J Kaphengst may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.