skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/08/21 5:43:50 AM

Ortiz-Singh, Janice

CPSO#: 96864

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Tagalog

Education:De La Salle University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3Y5
Phone: (905) 792-0074
Fax: (905) 792-0078 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Singh and J. Ortiz-Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Singh ( CPSO# 96574 )
Dr. J. Ortiz-Singh ( CPSO# 96864 )

Business Address:
101-2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3Y5
Phone Number: (905) 792-0074

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2013 Active
             Dr.  Janice Ortiz-Singh may practice medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.