THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 12:12:30 PM
Simmons, Rachel Ann
CPSO#:
96845
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Indiana University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Howard Mutual Medical Centre
Box 667
20129 Erie Street South
Ridgetown ON N0P 2C0
Phone: (519) 674-2600 Ext. 1
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Sep 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Sep 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2016 |
|
Active |