THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:02:10 AM
Sacchini, Clara
CPSO#:
96829
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: University Of Parma, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
435 The Boardwalk
KARMA IVF
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:02 Aug 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Sep 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
|
Active |