THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:13:02 PM
De Jager, Peter Salomon Christopher
CPSO#:
96827
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College of Dublin, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5649
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter S.C. De Jager Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 21 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:01 Oct 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 Apr 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2013 |
|
Active |