skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 15:40:14 PM

Richardson, Devon Paula

CPSO#: 96814

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
390 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone: (905) 882-6566 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEVON PAULA RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 29 Oct 2011
EL - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 30 Oct 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
EL - Colorectal Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2013