skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/10/21 23:22:35 PM

Anees, Farah

CPSO#: 96778

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
15810 Midway Rd
Addison TX  75001
United States
Phone: 9724588111

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Farah Anees Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida
USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Jan 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2013 Active
             Dr. Farah Anees may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.