THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:29:47 AM
Ezekwem, Victor Chidi
CPSO#:
96776
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ibo
Education: UNIVERSITY OF JOS, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Victor Ezekwem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 12 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients requesting a copy of their medical records may contact: Dr. Victor Ezekwem c/o Dr. Segun Omoseni
101 Erie Street East, Windsor, ON, N9A 3W9
Date Received: 18 Oct 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Sep 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Dec 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2015 |