THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:38:41 PM
Mabifa, ola Lawal
CPSO#:
96756
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 4217
Fax: (519) 749-4271
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: August 29, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On August 31, 2022, Grand River Hospital notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Mabifa’s hospital privileges were suspended from August 29, 2022 to September 2, 2022, inclusive.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:05 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLA LAWAL MABIFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MABIFA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2012 |