THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 17:20:09 PM
Al-Amodi, Hussein Abdullah Omar
CPSO#:
96744
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
01 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Mar 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Hadhramout Univ of Science & Technology, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:01 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Sep 2011 to 12 Jan 2012
PEAP - R - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2012 to 12 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 03 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2019 |