THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:09:23 PM
Rehan, Muhammad
CPSO#:
96736
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
16 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Karachi, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:16 Dec 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 23 Nov 2011
AVP - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 24 Nov 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 17 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2016 |