THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 19:16:28 PM
Rice, Brenda Lynn
CPSO#:
96729
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5063
Fax: (705) 876-5181
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:09 Mar 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:01 Sep 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 09 May 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
|
Active |