THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:27:16 PM
Coleman, Elizabeth Jeanette
CPSO#:
96717
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Feb 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Centre for
Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881
Fax: (905) 430-4033
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences |
Whitby |
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care |
Penetanguishene |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Forensic Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH JEANETTE COLEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLEMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Sep 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2013 |