THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:45:42 AM
Davies, Anne Marie
CPSO#:
96715
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Mar 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:17 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Sep 2021 |