skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 7:47:45 AM

Sharma, Anand

CPSO#: 96694

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Maulana Azad Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Aug 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Aug 2012