THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 14:57:43 PM
Suppiah, Subramanian Nagappan
CPSO#:
96648
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suppiah Clinical Endocrinology
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 210
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Phone: 519-741-5252 Ext. 225
Fax: 519-266-1200
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:24 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUBRAMANIAN NAGAPPAN SUPPIAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUPPIAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
EL - Infectious Diseases
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Aug 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2016 |