THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:24:41 PM
Ruiz Mirazo, Eider
CPSO#:
96641
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
23 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of the Basque Country, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 21 Oct 2011
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 22 Oct 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2013 |