skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/10/21 0:30:46 AM

Hannon, Breffni Louise

CPSO#: 96634

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Supportive Care
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Ext. 2508
Fax: (416) 946-2866 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Breffni Hannon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hannon ( CPSO# 96634 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Supportive Care
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Mar 2018 CFPC Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective:19 Feb 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 03 Oct 2011
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2021 Active
 Dr. BREFFNI LOUISE HANNON may practise medicine independently in palliative medicine.