THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 16:15:03 PM
Farago III, Peter Joseph
CPSO#:
96622
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1883 Turner Road
Windsor ON N8W 3K2
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: 5192534713
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Nov 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 06 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Oct 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Oct 2014 |
|
Active |