THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:42:14 AM
Vijayakumar, Sindhu
CPSO#:
96621
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
03 May 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 22 Jul 2011 to 13 Oct 2011
AVP - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 14 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 03 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 May 2017 |