THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:26:49 AM
Friedlander, Richard
CPSO#:
96594
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
18 Nov 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2013 |