THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:27:23 PM
Kara, Ali Alnoor
CPSO#:
96559
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Wingham and District Hospital |
Wingham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:28 Jul 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALI ALNOOR KARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Oct 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2013 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 29 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: October 29, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Ali Alnoor Kara was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Care or control of a motor vehicle with over 80mg blood alcohol, contrary to Section 253(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
DATE: September 11, 2017
SENTENCE: 1 year driving prohibition; Victim Surcharge of $300.