THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 2:21:15 AM
Yau, Vivian Ka Yan
CPSO#:
96555
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 May 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Vivian Yau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 3 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Thunder Bay Regional Cancer Centre, 980 Oliver Road, Thunder Bay, Ontario P7B 6V4
Date Received: 05 Aug 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2011 to 04 Oct 2011
AVP - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2011 to 12 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Apr 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Apr 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2020 |