THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:19:58 PM
Olynych, Timothy John
CPSO#:
96545
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2505 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1H 1E4
Phone: 6137252113
Fax: 6137250317
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:27 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN OLYNYCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLYNYCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Jul 2011 to 07 Aug 2011
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 08 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2014 |