skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/08/21 6:37:05 AM

Chandra, Prakash

CPSO#: 96520

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Endocrinology Centres
2979
Bovaird Drive E
Brampton ON  L6S 0C6
Phone: (905) 595-0560
Fax: (905) 595-0562 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Prakash Chandra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chandra ( CPSO# 96520 )

Business Address:
LMC Endocrinology Centres
2979 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6S 0C6
Phone Number: (905) 595-0560


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India
USA - California
USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:06 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013 Active
                   Dr.  Prakash  Chandra  may  practise  medicine  independently in Internal
                  Medicine,  Endocrinology and Metabolism in an outpatient setting, only.