THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:32:37 AM
Gu, Zaodi
CPSO#:
96515
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Calgary, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-5651
Fax: 705-759-5659
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Zaodi Gu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 10 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:28 Feb 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZAODI GU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 18 Oct 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2016 |