THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:13:20 PM
Freitas, Vivianne Aguilera Rolim De
CPSO#:
96464
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 May 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Joint Department of Medical Imaging
University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: 416-946-2000 Ext. 5608
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:14 Jul 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jan 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jul 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jul 2023 |
|
Active |