skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 15:09:06 PM

Rossi Ricci, Alessandra

CPSO#: 96447

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Pavia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centretown Community Health Centre
420 Cooper street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2N6
Canada
Phone: 613-233-4697
Fax: 613-233-4541
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:15 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALESSANDRA ROSSI RICCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSI RICCI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 24 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 24 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 12 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2018