skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/09/21 12:24:06 PM

Al Moaigel, Hala

CPSO#: 96436

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Faisal Road
Dammam 
Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HALA AL MOAIGEL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL MOAIGEL is enrolled at WESTERN UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. AL MOAIGEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL MOAIGEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL MOAIGEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL MOAIGEL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL MOAIGEL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2022.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 29 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2014 to 06 May 2014
CF - Paediatric Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021