THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:22:44 PM
Mourant, Lindsay Michelle
CPSO#:
96433
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Touro College of Osteopathic Medicine NY, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:16 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 18 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 19 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 19 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 19 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 19 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Apr 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2018 |