THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:53:59 PM
Mitchell, Craig Andrew
CPSO#:
96410
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
340 Union Street
Kingston ON K7L 4E6
Phone: (613) 354-7486
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CRAIG ANDREW MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2014 |