THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:40:13 PM
Shurrab, Mohammed Alsadeq Nagy Sadeq
CPSO#:
96388
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: OCTOBER 6 UNIVERSITY, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Jun 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2017 to 31 May 2018
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2018 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2023 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Sep 2023 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Sep 2023 |
|
Active |