THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:39:36 PM
Galhardo Jr, Carlos
CPSO#:
96382
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Nov 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Nov 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:15 Nov 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 07 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2023 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2026 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2023 |
|
Active |