THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 3:09:32 AM
Noone, Damien Gerard
CPSO#:
96349
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Nephrology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 204124
Fax: (416) 813-6271
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:06 Dec 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:06 Dec 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Sep 2014
CF - Paediatric Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
|
Active |