THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 12:07:57 PM
Malavade, Tushar Suryakant
CPSO#:
96292
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu
Education: University of Mumbai, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163404800
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:02 Oct 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TUSHAR SURYAKANT MALAVADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAVADE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2019 |