skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/08/21 7:51:05 AM

Jha, Shalini

CPSO#: 96272

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 56586 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Sood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sood ( CPSO# 86180 )
Dr. S. Jha ( CPSO# 96272 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
470 Chrysler
Suite 11-15
Brampton ON  L6S 6G3
Phone Number: (905) 790-9030

Business Address:
West GTA Endoscopy
Suite 183
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHALINI JHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 13 Jul 2011 to 05 Oct 2011
AVP - Geriatric Medicine

Western University, 06 Oct 2011 to 17 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

Western University, 18 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013