skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 4:59:44 AM

Falardeau, Brandi Lynn

CPSO#: 96233

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Community Health Centre
263 Weller Avenue #4
Kingston ON  K7K 2V4
Phone: (613) 542 2949
Fax: (613) 542-7657 Electoral District: 06

Medical Records Location

Address: My new practice location is: Kingston Community Health Centre. 263 Weller Avenue, Kingston, Ontario, K7K 2V4 Fax: 613-542-7657.
Date Received: 16 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Mar 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRANDI LYNN FALARDEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALARDEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 09 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2015 to 09 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2015