THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:12:34 PM
Rogan Ducic, Milena
CPSO#:
96196
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Rogan, Milena (used until: 22 Jul 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Serbian
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Geriatric Psychiatry Community
Services Ottawa
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
Phone: (613) 562-9777
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MILENA ROGAN DUCIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGAN DUCIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
AVP - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2017 |