THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:15:40 AM
Al-Shamsi, Mohammed Rashid Abdullah
CPSO#:
96175
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medi, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Oman
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 07 Apr 2017 to 23 Jun 2017
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
Queen's University, 24 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |