THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:01:30 PM
Sadler, Dafni Addisen
CPSO#:
96154
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
703 - 525 University Ave
Telelink Mental Health Program
Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6503
Fax: (416) 813-2189
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAFNI ADDISEN SADLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Dec 2011
AVP - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2011 to 09 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 02 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2016 |