skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 7:34:55 AM

Khanna, Robin

CPSO#: 96144

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Nov 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville, Ontario
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton, ON
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Khanna ( CPSO# 96144 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L2S 0A9

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBIN KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2016