skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/11/21 4:07:50 AM

Bal, Manpartap Singh

CPSO#: 96117

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310 Ext. 2227 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

725 Arlington Park Pl
Kingston Ophthalmology and Vision S
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

1-29 Wallbridge Cres
Macula Eye Clinic
Belleville ON  K8P 1Z5
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

91 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 5L3
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

15 Market St E
Wedgewood Retirement Residence
Brockville ON  K6V 0A6
Canada
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Bal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bal ( CPSO# 96117 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Glaen Eye Centre
27 Place D`Armes
Kingston ON  K7K 6Z6
Phone Number: (613) 507-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANPARTAP SINGH BAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016