skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/10/21 23:02:03 PM

Patel, Nirav

CPSO#: 96114

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 640-1103
Fax: (416) 640-1106 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

GNMI
464 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2M 5V4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New Jersey
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:18 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Jan 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2013 Active
 Dr.  Nirav  Patel  may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology,
            only.