skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/08/21 6:47:53 AM

riva-cambrin, jeremy j

CPSO#: 96109

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Nov 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St josephs Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 5306486
Fax: 4165306076 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeremy Riva-Cambrin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. j. riva-cambrin ( CPSO# 96109 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Anishnawbe Health Toronto
179 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 920-2605

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Hospital
Psychiatry
5 floor morrow wing
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: 4165306486

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEREMY J RIVA-CAMBRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVA-CAMBRIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2016