THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:46:38 AM
Berberich, Amanda Jean
CPSO#:
96108
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Brahm, Amanda Jean (used until: 28 Jun 2017 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: State University of New York, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6245
Fax: 5196466067
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:26 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMANDA JEAN BERBERICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERBERICH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2016 |