THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:52:57 PM
Livingston, Michael Hobbs
CPSO#:
96102
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St W
Room 4E
Hamilton ON l8n 3z5
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Surgery |
Effective:11 Oct 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL HOBBS LIVINGSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIVINGSTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator Program
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2021 |