skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 8:14:09 AM

Ashkanase, Jenna Lee

CPSO#: 96101

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Nov 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNA LEE ASHKANASE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHKANASE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2020