THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 22:31:47 PM
Saleeb, Rola Magdy Youssef
CPSO#:
96099
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
2nd floor cardinal carter wing
Pathology department
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 4163604000 Ext. 46129
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROLA MAGDY YOUSSEF SALEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEEB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2019 |